EP1344312 - LINEARIZED CLASS C AMPLIFIER WITH DYNAMIC BIASING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOWLATI, Tirdad Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/14] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/01] | Pennings, Johannes, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2003/38] | Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01271690.8 | 05.12.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001IB02304 | Priority number, date | US20000739500 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: US 739500 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0250994 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1344312 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344312 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/02, H03F1/32 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
H03F3/193 (EP,KR,US);
H03F3/21 (KR);
H03F1/0261 (EP,KR,US);
H03F3/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Title | German: | LINEARISIERTER KLASSE-C-VERSTÄRKER MIT DYNAMISCHEM VORSTROM | [2003/38] | English: | LINEARIZED CLASS C AMPLIFIER WITH DYNAMIC BIASING | [2003/38] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR LINEARISE DE CLASSE C A POLARISATION DYNAMIQUE | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.09.2010 | BE | 01.09.2010 | CY | 01.09.2010 | DK | 01.09.2010 | FI | 01.09.2010 | IT | 01.09.2010 | NL | 01.09.2010 | SE | 01.09.2010 | TR | 01.09.2010 | GR | 02.12.2010 | IE | 05.12.2010 | LU | 05.12.2010 | ES | 12.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | PT | 03.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IE | 05.12.2010 | ||
LU | 05.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IE | 05.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 01.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4377788 (CHRISTOPHER TODD J, et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 8 - column 7, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]NL8901823 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]EP0622895 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US6130579 (IYER NATHAN R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | Examination | JP2611562B |