EP1346362 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING A MULTIMEDIA SUMMARY OF A VIDEO PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGNIHOTRI, Lalitha Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DIMITROVA, Nevenka Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2003/39] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01271747.6 | 10.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001IB02424 | Priority number, date | US20000747107 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: US 747107 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0251139 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1346362 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/00 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04N21/8549 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/8455 (EP,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2516 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/455 (EP,US);
G11B2220/61 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER MULTIMEDIA-ZUSAMMENFASSUNG EINES VIDEOPROGRAMMS | [2003/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING A MULTIMEDIA SUMMARY OF A VIDEO PROGRAM | [2003/39] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR UN SOMMAIRE MULTIMEDIA D'UN PROGRAMME VIDEO | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/05] | 25.09.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0028440 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * abstract * * page 9, line 5 - page 15, line 6 * [Y] 2-7,9-14; | [Y]US6160950 (SHIMAZAKI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 9, lines 24-27; figures 8,9,12-16 * * column 12, line 5 - column 12, line 41 *; | [Y]US5982979 (OMATA MITSUTERU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 23 *; | [Y]EP0810794 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * column 4, line 14 - column 4, line 58; figures 6,8,11 *; | [A]US5499103 (MANKOVITZ ROY J [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US5523796 (MARSHALL CONNIE T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 21 * |