EP1344423 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PACKET-BASED ACCESS OF CLASSICAL ISDN/PSTN SUBSCRIBERS TO A SWITCHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [2008/09] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÖBIG, Norbert Im Erlich 79 64291 Darmstadt / DE | [2003/38] | Application number, filing date | 01271777.3 | 12.11.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001DE04238 | Priority number, date | DE2000163081 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10063081 | [2003/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0251195 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344423 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344423 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0442 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13109 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13167 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13196 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PAKETBASIERTEN ANSCHLUSS VON KLASSISCHEN ISDN/PSTN-TEILNEHMERN AN EIN VERMITTLUNGSSYSTEM | [2003/38] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PACKET-BASED ACCESS OF CLASSICAL ISDN/PSTN SUBSCRIBERS TO A SWITCHING SYSTEM | [2003/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE CONNECTER EN MODE PAQUETS DES ABONNES A DES RESEAUX ISDN/PSTN CLASSIQUES A UN SYSTEME DE COMMUTATION | [2003/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 08.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0966145 (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0121] *; | [A] - LAKSHMI-RATAN R A, "THE LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES SOFTSWITCH - REALIZING THE PROMISE OF CONVERGENCE", BELL LABS TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (199904), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 1089-7089, pages 174 - 195, XP000851517 [A] 1-13 * page 180, column L, paragraph L - page 181, column L, paragraph L * * page 186, column L, paragraph 2 - page 191, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bltj.2171 | [A] - HUITEMA C ET AL, "AN ARCHITECTURE FOR RESIDENTIAL INTERNET TELEPHONY SERVICE", IEEE NETWORK, (199905), vol. 13, no. 3, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 50 - 56, XP000870631 [A] 1-13 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.767139 | [A] - ARAZI D, "VOICE OVER DSL", FUNKSCHAU, (19991112), vol. 72, no. 24, ISSN 0016-2841, pages 64 - 66, XP000940343 [A] 1-13 * column W * |