EP1351793 - METHOD FOR LASER WELDING A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECK, Thomas Jägerstr. 25 D 16341 Zepernick / DE | 02 /
COX, Nigel-Philip Gipsstr. 23 B 10119 Berlin / DE | 03 /
STETTEGAST, Silke Paul-Robeson-Str. 35 10439 Berlin / DE | 04 /
WILKENHÖNER, Rolf Kaiserin-Augusta-Allee 10589 Berlin / DE | [2003/42] | Application number, filing date | 01271823.5 | 20.12.2001 | [2003/42] | WO2001EP15121 | Priority number, date | EP20000128575 | 27.12.2000 Original published format: EP 00128575 | [2003/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02051578 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1351793 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/08 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
F01D5/005 (EP,US);
B23K26/08 (EP,US);
B23K26/28 (EP,US);
F01D5/326 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
F05D2230/13 (EP,US);
F05D2230/232 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM LASERSCHWEISSEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES | [2003/42] | English: | METHOD FOR LASER WELDING A WORKPIECE | [2003/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE SOUDAGE PAR LASER D'UNE PIECE | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 04.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.07.2007 | 24.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/16] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/16] | Divisional application(s) | EP04026103.4 / EP1504843 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4896944 (IRWIN TIMOTHY L [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 31; figure - * [Y] 10-12; | [X]US4670638 (PAVLIN CYRILLE F [FR]) [X] 1,5,9 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 37; figure - *; | [X]WO9920430 (THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [DY]US3761201 (SILVERSTEIN S, et al) [DY] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19817851 (LPKF LASER & ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5407326 (LARDELLIER ALAIN M J [FR]) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US4314007 (GESSINGER GERNOT) [A] 10-12 * the whole document * |