EP1451917 - HANDHELD GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freeplay Market Development Limited 2 Stone Building, Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3TH / GB | [2008/22] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Freeplay Market Development Limited 2 Stone Building, Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3TH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Pierre, c/o Freeplay Market Devel. Ltd 3rd Floor, 56-58 Conduit Street London W1R 9FD / GB | 02 /
HUTCHINSON, John E., Freeplay Market Devel. Ltd 3rd Floor, 56-58 Conduit Street London W1R 9FD / GB | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 01271829.2 | 24.12.2001 | [2004/36] | WO2001GB05778 | Priority number, date | GB20000031639 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: GB 0031639 | GB20010023745 | 03.10.2001 Original published format: GB 0123745 | GB20010023746 | 03.10.2001 Original published format: GB 0123746 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02052692 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1451917 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451917 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/18, H02J7/00, H02J7/35, H02J7/14, F21L13/06, H02K1/16 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
F21L13/06 (EP,US);
H02J7/0044 (EP,US);
H02J7/1415 (EP,US);
H02J7/35 (EP,US);
H02K1/16 (EP,US);
H02K7/1861 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/36] | Title | German: | HANDGEHALTENEGENERATOR | [2004/36] | English: | HANDHELD GENERATOR | [2004/36] | French: | GENERATEUR PORTATIF | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.04.2005 | 31.12.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2006 | 31.12.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   09.04.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | BE | 28.05.2008 | CY | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | IT | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | TR | 28.05.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | ES | 08.09.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | IE | 24.12.2008 | LU | 24.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
TR | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LU | 24.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LU | 24.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LU | 24.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 08.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2620682 (ARNOLD PERROT) [A] 3* figure - *; | [X]US4360860 (JOHNSON HUGH G, et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 13 *; | [X]DE29520719U (BERGUNDER NILS [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5998975 (TADA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 3 * | Examination | US3210634 | DE29822305U | DE29918342U | WO0028637 |