EP1344401 - DATA DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagracard S.A. 22, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2006/49] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Nagracard S.A. 22, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | ||
For all designated states Hill, Michael John Route de Commugny 10 CH-1296 Coppet / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Michael, John Route de Commugny 10 CH-1296 Coppet / CH | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. 62 route de Clementy 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 01272197.3 | 19.12.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001IB02591 | Priority number, date | CH20000002518 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: CH 251800 | [2003/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02052854 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344401 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344401 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N7/167, G07F17/16 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
H04N21/632 (EP,US);
H04N21/6334 (KR);
G07F17/16 (EP,US);
H04N21/222 (EP,US);
H04N21/23106 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Extension states | AL | 16.06.2003 | LT | 16.06.2003 | LV | 16.06.2003 | MK | 16.06.2003 | RO | 16.06.2003 | SI | 16.06.2003 | Title | German: | DATENVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2003/38] | English: | DATA DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [2003/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION D'INFORMATIONS | [2006/31] |
Former [2003/38] | SYST ME DE DISTRIBUTION D'INFORMATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | [2009/33] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 24.01.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5341425 (WASILEWSKI ANTHONY J [US], et al) [Y] 2,6,13 * abstract * * figures 2-4; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0672991 (INST OF SYSTEMS SCIENCE [SG]) [A] 14 * figures 1-4; claims 1,4 *; | [A]EP0843449 (SUNHAWK CORP INC [US]) [A] 2,6,13,15 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0884669 (MITSUBISHI CORP [JP]) [A] 2,6,13 * column 6, line 12 - line 54 * * figures 3-5; claims 2,5 *; | [YA]US5898456 (WAHL STEFAN [DE]) [Y] 3,5,8-11 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 32; figures 1-4,6 * [A] 1,4; | [XY]WO0011871 (OPEN ENTERTAINMENT INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, line 25 - line 29 * * figures 1-3,5; claims 1,11 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8-11,13; | [A]EP0996074 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 2,6,13 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 3,4 *; | [A] - CHANG Y -H, "AN OPEN-SYSTEMS APPROACH TO VIDEO ON DEMAND", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE,US,IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, (19940501), vol. 32, no. 5, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 68 - 80, XP000451097 |