EP1343808 - PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF AN LHRH PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/38] | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF A PEPTIDE HAVING A TRP RESIDUE | ||
[2005/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ipsen Manufacturing Ireland Limited Blanchardstown Industrial Park Blanchardstown Dublin 15 / IE | [2006/37] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Ipsen Manufacturing Ireland Limited Blanchardstown Industrial Park Blanchardstown, Dublin 15 / IE | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Kinerton Limited Blanchardstown Industrial Park Blanchardstown, Dublin 15 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKSON, Steven, Allen 81 Noth Mill Street Holliston, MA / US | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Ryan, Anne Mary, et al Anne Ryan & Co 2 Crofton Terrace Dun Laoghaire, County Dublin A96 V6P7 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Ryan, Anne Mary, et al c/o Anne Ryan & Co. 60 Northumberland Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 01272223.7 | 19.12.2001 | [2003/38] | WO2001IE00159 | Priority number, date | IE20000001079 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: IE 20001079 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02051861 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1343808 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1343808 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/23 | [2005/36] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [2003/38] | C07K1/04, C07K1/06, C07K7/23 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 23.06.2003 | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 23.06.2003 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE SYNTHESE EINES LHRH PEPTIDES | [2005/36] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF AN LHRH PEPTIDE | [2005/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE D'UN PEPTIDE LHRH | [2005/36] |
Former [2003/38] | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE SYNTHESE EINES PEPTIDES MIT EINEM TRYPTOPHANREST | ||
Former [2003/38] | PROCESS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF A PEPTIDE HAVING A TRP RESIDUE | ||
Former [2003/38] | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE D'UN PEPTIDE COMPORTANT UN RESIDU DE TRYPTOPHANE (TRY) | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | LU | 19.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | TR | 13.09.2006 | |
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
LU | 19.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | GR | 14.12.2006 | |
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | MC | 31.12.2006 | |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 13.09.2006 | |
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | IT | 13.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4569927 (RIVIER JEAN E F [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 3, line 30 - column 6, line 26; example 1; claims 1,8 *; | [X]DE3931731 (EXPANSIA SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * example 1 *; | [X] - MERY J & CALAS B, "Tryptophan reduction and histidine racemization during deprotection by catalytic transfer hydrogenation and of an analog of the luteinizing hormone releasing factor", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE & PROTEIN RESEARCH, (198804), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 412 - 419, XP008005285 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [X] - PINEDA JL ET AL., "Effect of GnRh Anatgonist, [ac-delta-3 Pro-1, pFDPhe-2, DTrp-3,6] GnRh, on Pulsatile Gonadotrop in Secretion in the Castrate Male Primate", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (198302), vol. 56, no. 2, pages 420 - 422, XP008005269 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | Examination | US4211693 | BE904458 |