EP1350414 - CONCENTRIC CO-PLANAR MULTIBAND ELECTRO-ACOUSTIC CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagren, Anders Box 2037 750 02 Uppsala / SE | [2011/25] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Sagren, Anders Leo Fenders Väg 1 752 37 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/18] |
Former [2003/41] | Hagström, Lena Dr Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01272441.5 | 21.12.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001SE02896 | Priority number, date | US20000257693P | 26.12.2000 Original published format: US 257693 P | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02052892 | Date: | 04.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350414 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/24, // (H04R1/22, 9:06, 9:04) | [2003/41] | CPC: |
H04R9/063 (EP,US);
H04R1/24 (EP,KR,US);
H04R9/025 (EP,US);
H04R9/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONZENTRISCHER COPLANARER ELEKTROAKUSTISCHER MEHRBAND-UMSETZER | [2003/41] | English: | CONCENTRIC CO-PLANAR MULTIBAND ELECTRO-ACOUSTIC CONVERTER | [2003/41] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR ELECTROACOUSTIQUE MULTIBANDE CONCENTRIQUE COPLANAIRE | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 19.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/04] | Divisional application(s) | EP06116887.8 / EP1703765 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2008 | 31.12.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2009 | 31.12.2010 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2011 | 31.12.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8911201 (KEF ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20; | [A]GB2250658 (CANON RES CT EUROPE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20; | [A]US5181253 (JORDAN JEFF B [US]) [A] 1-20; | [A]EP0771133 (HARMAN INT IND [US])[A] 1-20; | [EA]EP1173042 (KEF AUDIO UK LTD [GB]) [EA] 1-20 |