EP1347050 - NOVEL POTASSIUM CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2006/21] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. No. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOI, Hiromichi, c/o Yamanouchi Pharma. Co. Ltd 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 02 /
INAMURA, Kohei, c/o Yamanouchi Pharma. Co. Ltd 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 03 /
SANO, Yorikata, c/o Yamanouchi Pharma. Co. Ltd 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 04 /
MIYAKE, Akira, c/o Yamanouchi Pharma. Co. Ltd 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 05 /
MOCHIZUKI, Shinobu, c/o Yamanouchi Pharma. Co. Ltd 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01272534.7 | 26.12.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001JP11458 | Priority number, date | JP20000398521 | 27.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000398521 | JP20010113131 | 11.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001113131 | [2003/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02053730 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347050 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C07K14/705, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12Q1/02, G01N33/68 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
G01N33/5023 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
G01N33/507 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | C12N15/09, C07K14/705, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12Q1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE KALIUMKANÄLE | [2003/39] | English: | NOVEL POTASSIUM CHANNEL | [2003/39] | French: | NOUVEAU CANAL POTASSIQUE | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2003 | Translation filed | 27.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 09.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/22] | Divisional application(s) | EP07023347.3 / EP1908831 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO02088378 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [E] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0212340 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US]) [E] 1,2,5-10 * the whole document *; | [E]JP2002233369 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [E] 2,5-10 * the whole document *; | [X] - EMBL, (20000905), Database accession no. AL136087, URL: EBI, XP002284934 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | [XP] - GIRARD C ET AL, "GENOMIC AND FUNCTIONAL CHARACTERISTICS OF NOVEL HUMAN PANCREATIC 2P DOMAIN K+ CHANNELS", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (2001), vol. 282, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 249 - 256, XP002908280 [XP] 2,5-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2001.4562 | [A] - LESAGE F ET AL, "Molecular and functional properties of two-pore-domain potassium channels", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY: RENAL, FLUID AND ELECTROLYTE PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, US, (200011), vol. 279, no. 5 Part 2, ISSN 0363-6127, pages F793 - F801, XP002256647 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - RUDY B, "DIVERSITY AND UBIQUITY OF POTASSIUM CHANNELS", NEUROSCIENCE, (1988), vol. 25, no. 3, ISSN 0306-4522, pages 729 - 749, XP002292581 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4522(88)90033-4 | [T] - HAN JAEHEE ET AL, "Functional properties of four splice variants of a human pancreatic tandem-pore K+ channel, TALK-1.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, (200309), vol. 285, no. 3 Part 1, ISSN 0002-9513, pages C529 - C538, XP009035390 [T] * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO0052164 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al); | [A] - GRIBBLE F.M. ET AL., "Sulfonylurea sensitivity of adenosine triphosphate-sensitive potassium channels from beta cells and extrapancreatic tissues", METABOLISM, (200010), vol. 49, no. 10, pages 3 - 6, XP002908281 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/meta.2000.17822 | [XP] - CHRISTOPHE GIRARD ET AL., "Genomic and functional characteristics of novel human pancreatic 2P domain K+ channels", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (200103), vol. 282, no. 1, pages 249 - 256, XP002908280 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2001.4562 |