EP1353540 - MANUFACTURING METHOD OF CIRCUIT BOARD MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/42] | PRODUCTION METHOD OF CIRCUIT BOARD MODULE | ||
[2004/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEGAWA, Shigetoshi 2496-5, Hagiu Niihama-shi, Ehime 792-0050 / JP | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Grape, Knut, et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Grape, Knut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01272893.7 | 27.12.2001 | [2003/42] | WO2001JP11518 | Priority number, date | JP20000402873 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000402873 | [2003/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02054843 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1353540 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1353540 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/36 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
H05K3/361 (EP,US);
H05K3/36 (KR);
H05K1/117 (EP,US);
H05K1/141 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09427 (EP,US);
H05K3/323 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN LEITERPLATTEN-MODUL | [2003/42] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD OF CIRCUIT BOARD MODULE | [2004/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MODULE A CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIME | [2003/42] |
Former [2003/42] | PRODUCTION METHOD OF CIRCUIT BOARD MODULE | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2002 | Translation filed | 19.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 01.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2004 | BE | 03.11.2004 | CH | 03.11.2004 | CY | 03.11.2004 | FI | 03.11.2004 | IT | 03.11.2004 | LI | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | SE | 03.11.2004 | TR | 03.11.2004 | IE | 30.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | LU | 03.01.2005 | DK | 03.02.2005 | GR | 03.02.2005 | ES | 14.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
CY | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IT | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
SE | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 30.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 03.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
CY | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
SE | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 30.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 03.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
CY | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 30.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 03.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 30.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 03.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 30.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 03.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 30.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5592365 (SUGIMOTO TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 3* column 12, line 19 - line 29; figures 12,13 *; | [XY]GB2345201 (IBM [US]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 4 * * table 1 * * page 18, line 18 - line 19 * * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 3 * [Y] 3 | International search | [X]JPH01251787 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JPH05191008 (SHARP KK); | [X]JPH0846314 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [X]JPH10284818 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |