EP1296768 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE IN-SITU EMPTYING OF INCONTINENCE ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Svi Anlagen GmbH Holtweg 40 41379 Brüggen / DE | For all designated states Ahe GmbH Rochusstrasse 1 41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [2003/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOHNEN, Horst Breslauerstrasse 34 41366 Schwalmtal / DE | 02 /
THOMAS, Gottfried Finkenweg 9 D-41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Richter, Joachim RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Richter, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01273073.5 | 19.11.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001EP13352 | Priority number, date | DE2001211828U | 20.07.2001 Original published format: DE 20111828 U | [2003/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03009942 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1296768 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1296768 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B03B9/06 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
B03B9/061 (EP,US);
Y02W30/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VOR-ORT-ENTSORGUNG VON INKONTINENZ-ARTIKELN | [2003/14] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE IN-SITU EMPTYING OF INCONTINENCE ARTICLES | [2003/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EVACUATION EN PLACE D'ARTICLES D'INCONTINENCE | [2003/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.01.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 09.02.2004 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.03.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2015/51] |
Former [2007/09] | CY | 31.03.2004 | |
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | MC | 30.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5292075 (BARTLETT BRUCE L [US]) [A] 1,14 * abstract * * column 4, line 45 - column 8, line 28 ** column 10, line 11 - line 38 *; | [DA]DE19853520 (KAEFFERLEIN DANIELA [DE]) [DA] 1,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - column 4, line 13 * |