EP1368195 - RESILIENT FLOOR SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 2752-3273 Quebec Inc. Suite 2900, 1000 de la Gauchetiere Montreal, Quebec H3B 4W5 / CA | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMIEUX, Alain 1360 Cherbourg Street Sherbrooke, Québec J1K 2P2 / CA | 02 /
TOMARIN, Seymour 2814 Decew Road St. Catharines, Ontario L2R 6P7 / CA | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/17] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/50] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01273099.0 | 15.01.2001 | [2003/50] | WO2001CA00035 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055299 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368195 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, E04F15/18, E01C13/00 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
E04F15/18 (EP,US);
E01C13/045 (EP,US);
E04F15/203 (EP);
E04F15/22 (EP,US);
E04F15/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | 09.09.2003 | LT | 09.09.2003 | LV | 09.09.2003 | MK | 09.09.2003 | RO | 09.09.2003 | SI | 09.09.2003 | Title | German: | ELASTISCHE BODENFLÄCHE | [2003/50] | English: | RESILIENT FLOOR SURFACE | [2003/50] | French: | REVETEMENT DE SOL ELASTIQUE | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2005 | 31.01.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2007 | 31.01.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000034823 ; | [X]JPH07137189 ; | BE871775 [ ] (BISSON JOSEPH, et al); | [XA]DE2850102 (BISSON JOSEPH) [X] 1-4,7,11-24 * please note that the page numbers referred to, are those appearing on the bottom of the respective page *; page 8, line 11 - line 14; figure -; claims 1,5-8 * * page 2, line 1 - line 5 * * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 10 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 10 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 9 * * page 14, line 6 - page 17, line 14 * [A] 5,6,8-10,25; | [X]WO9856993 (QUEBEC INC 2752 3273 [CA], et al) [X] 1,5,7-11,16,17,25 * abstract * * page 2, line 15 - line 29 * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 6 * * page 5, line 24 - line 31 * * page 6, line 10 - line 21 * * page 7, line 1 - line 10 *; | [X]WO9926784 (BENECKE KALIKO AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,11,14,17 * abstract * * page 2, line 6 - line 10 * * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 4 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 44, Database accession no. 2000-492652, XP002173182 & JP2000034823 A 20000202 (JUKA PLASTICS KK) [X] 1,7,11,16,17 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 30, Database accession no. 1995-227981, XP002173183 & JPH07137189 A 19950530 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,12 * abstract * |