EP1356490 - A FLUORESCENT LAMP AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOUD, Leendert, H. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 01273150.1 | 14.12.2001 | [2003/44] | WO2001IB02551 | Priority number, date | EP20010200127 | 15.01.2001 Original published format: EP 01200127 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02056331 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1356490 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/24, H01J61/32, H01J61/33 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
H01J61/327 (EP,US);
H01J61/33 (EP,US);
H01J9/247 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | LEUCHTSTOFFLAMPE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2003/44] | English: | A FLUORESCENT LAMP AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2003/44] | French: | LAMPE FLUORESCENTE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 08.08.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5769530 (BIRO ATTILA [HU], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4374340 (BOUWKNEGT ALBERT [NL], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [AD]GB2335538 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [AD] 2 * claim 1 * |