Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004142163 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | US75467204 | 09.01.2004 | US5267502 | 17.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3746765B | Global Dossier | 15.02.2006 | B2 | JP2004518266 | 17.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | EP0114069 | 01.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1356716 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2004 | B1 | EP1356716 | 29.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | EP0114069 | 01.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE276640T | 15.10.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | EP0114069 | 01.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0109584 | 28.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | EP0114069 | 01.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2404954 | 13.03.2007 | C | CA2404954 | 30.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | EP0114069 | 01.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50103688D1 | 21.10.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | EP0114069 | 01.12.2001 | DE50103688 | 01.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU224652 | 28.12.2005 | B1 | HUP0300088 | 28.06.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | EP0114069 | 01.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA02009430 | 12.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | EP0114069 | 01.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL356203 | 14.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | EP0114069 | 01.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK16172002 | 02.05.2003 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | EP0114069 | 01.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02062110 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100507922B | Global Dossier | 19.08.2005 | B1 | KR20020082493 | 31.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1180664C | 15.12.2004 | C | CN1419802 | 21.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ20023687 | 12.02.2003 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10104488 | 14.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2225418T | 16.03.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1356716E | 31.01.2005 | E | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR200202244T | 21.03.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW558586B | 21.10.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6695999 | 24.02.2004 | B2 | US2002102385 | 01.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200207598 | 20.12.2004 | B | Priority number | Date | DE10104488 | 31.01.2001 |