EP1356716 - ELECTRICALLY-CONDUCTING FLOOR COVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2003/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜHL, Hans-Michael Lettengasse 35 69439 Hirschberg / DE | 02 /
GRAAB, Gerhard Nibelungenring 41 68199 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
PLATZER, Peter Sandbuckelgasse 26 69488 Birkenau / DE | 04 /
MÖLLER, Ralf Zur Rippersmühle 7 64668 Rimbach / DE | [2003/44] | Application number, filing date | 01273588.2 | 01.12.2001 | [2003/44] | WO2001EP14069 | Priority number, date | DE2001104488 | 31.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10104488 | [2003/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02062110 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1356716 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1356716 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05F3/02, B29C70/88 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
E04F15/12 (EP,US);
B32B3/10 (KR);
B29C70/882 (EP,US);
H05F3/025 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24331 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGER BODENBELAG | [2003/44] | English: | ELECTRICALLY-CONDUCTING FLOOR COVERING | [2003/44] | French: | REVETEMENT DE SOL ELECTROCONDUCTEUR | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.09.2004 | IE | 15.09.2004 | TR | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/51] | IE | 15.09.2004 | |
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | IE | 15.09.2004 | |
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | IE | 15.09.2004 | |
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | IE | 15.09.2004 | |
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5307233 (FORRY JOHN S [US]) [A] 1,3* claim 9 *; | [DA]EP0869217 (FORBO GIUBIASCO SA [CH]) [DA] 1-10 * page 3, line 39 - line 48; example 2; claim - * |