EP1360854 - Access system for an access network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/46] | ACCESS SYSTEM FOR AN ACCESS NETWORK | ||
[2006/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2003/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMAVAARA, Kalle Merivirta 6 A 16 FIN-02320 Espoo / FI | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Ungerer, Olaf, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Ungerer, Olaf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01273661.7 | 26.10.2001 | [2003/46] | WO2001EP12455 | Priority number, date | WO2001EP01271 | 06.02.2001 Original published format: PCT/EP01/01271 | [2006/38] |
Former [2003/46] | WO2001EP00127 | 06.02.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02063900 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1360854 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1360854 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30, H04Q7/22, H04Q11/04 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
H04M15/00 (EP);
H04M15/50 (EP);
H04M15/55 (EP);
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04M2215/204 (EP);
H04M2215/2046 (EP);
H04M2215/52 (EP);
H04W36/1446 (EP,US);
H04W80/00 (EP);
H04W92/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zugriffssystem für ein Zugriffsnetzwerk | [2006/08] | English: | Access system for an access network | [2006/08] | French: | Ssytème d'accés pour résaux d'accés | [2006/08] |
Former [2003/46] | ZUGRIFFSSYSTEM FÜR EIN ZUGRIFFSNETZWERK | ||
Former [2003/46] | ACCESS SYSTEM FOR AN ACCESS NETWORK | ||
Former [2003/46] | SYST ME D'ACC S POUR R SEAU D'ACC S | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 12.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06010265.4 / EP1761084 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2006 | BE | 19.07.2006 | CH | 19.07.2006 | CY | 19.07.2006 | FI | 19.07.2006 | LI | 19.07.2006 | NL | 19.07.2006 | TR | 19.07.2006 | DK | 19.10.2006 | SE | 19.10.2006 | GR | 20.10.2006 | IE | 26.10.2006 | LU | 26.10.2006 | ES | 30.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | PT | 19.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
TR | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
IE | 26.10.2006 | ||
LU | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
IE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
IE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
IE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9966742 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al); | [PA]WO0113660 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) |