EP1375758 - HYDRAULIC CONTROL CIRCUIT OF BOOM CYLINDER OF WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Japan Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Shin Caterpillar Mitsubishi Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHINO, Tetsuya, Shin Caterpillar Mitsubishi Ltd. 10-1, Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 158-8530 / JP | 02 /
SHIMADA, Yoshiyuki, Shin Caterpillar Mitsubishi 10-1, Yoga 4-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 158-8530 / JP | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01273678.1 | 14.12.2001 | [2004/01] | WO2001JP11005 | Priority number, date | JP20010029562 | 06.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001029562 | [2004/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02063107 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1375758 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1375758 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/22 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
F15B11/17 (EP,US);
E02F9/2203 (EP,US);
E02F9/2282 (EP,US);
E02F9/2285 (EP,US);
F15B11/024 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20576 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30525 (EP,US);
F15B2211/3058 (EP,US);
F15B2211/3116 (EP,US);
F15B2211/31576 (EP,US);
F15B2211/329 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6313 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6316 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6346 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6355 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6654 (EP,US);
F15B2211/78 (EP,US);
F15B2211/88 (EP,US);
Y10S37/902 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | E02F9/22, F15B11/02, F15B11/024 | Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT [2010/11] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHER STEUERKREIS FÜR EINEN AUSLEGERZYLINDER EINER BAUMASCHINE | [2004/01] | English: | HYDRAULIC CONTROL CIRCUIT OF BOOM CYLINDER OF WORKING MACHINE | [2004/01] | French: | MACHINE DE CHANTIER: CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE POUR VERIN DE FLECHE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2002 | Translation filed | 23.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2002 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19932948 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4367624 (OGATA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure - * | International search | [A]JPH09132927 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPH09151489 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPH11247236 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD); | [A]JPH0634443Y |