EP1291244 - MANUALLY HOUSED BACK MIRROR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murakami Corporation 12-25, Miyamoto-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka, 422-8569 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Murakami Corporation 12-25, Miyamoto-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka, 422-8569 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARASINA, Toru 4-11-15, Shimokawahara Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-0113 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMOTO, Masanori 2-10-16, Shida Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka 426-0071 / JP | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/11] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner, Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01273680.7 | 17.12.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001JP11028 | Priority number, date | JP20010027606 | 05.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001027606 | [2003/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02062622 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1291244 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/064 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
B60R1/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Title | German: | MANUELL EINKLAPPBARER RÜCKSPIEGEL | [2003/11] | English: | MANUALLY HOUSED BACK MIRROR | [2003/11] | French: | RETROVISEUR REPLIABLE MANUELLEMENT | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2002 | Translation filed | 30.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/37] | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6050046 ; | [Y]JPS6194844 ; | [A]JPS6092132 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850730), vol. 009, no. 183, Database accession no. (M - 400), & JP60050046 A 19850319 (NITSUSAN SHIYATAI KK) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860913), vol. 010, no. 270, Database accession no. (M - 517), & JP61094844 A 19860513 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850925), vol. 009, no. 238, Database accession no. (M - 416), & JP60092132 A 19850523 (NITSUSAN SHIYATAI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0520604Y ; | [A]JPS62177550U |