EP1427813 - METHOD FOR DENDRITIC CELLS-BASED IMMUNOTHERAPY OF TUMORS USING COMBINATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunex Corporation 51 University Street Seattle Washington 98101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states IMMUNEX CORPORATION 51 University Street Seattle Washington 98101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, Elaine, K. 1419 Broadmoor Drive East Seattle, WA 98112 / US | 02 /
LYMAN, Stuart, D. 1836 N. 53rd Street Seattle, WA 98103 / US | 03 /
LYNCH, David, H. 14180 N. Madison Avenue NE Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | 04 /
DE SMEDT, Thibaut, N. 5516 27th Avenue NE Seattle, WA 98105 / US | 05 /
MALISZEWSKI, Charles, R. 1014 Northwest 120th Seattle, WA 98177 / US | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01273795.3 | 23.10.2001 | [2004/25] | WO2001US46254 | Priority number, date | US20000242868P | 24.10.2000 Original published format: US 242868 P | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02066044 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1427813 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/06, A61K38/18, A61K38/20, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
A61K38/2086 (EP,US);
A61K38/191 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4615 (EP);
A61K39/4622 (EP);
A61K39/4635 (EP);
A61K39/464417 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/5154 (US);
A61K2039/5158 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/191, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/2086, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR AUF DENDRITISCHE ZELLEN BERUHENDEN IMMUNOTHERAPIE VON TUMOREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE | [2004/25] | English: | METHOD FOR DENDRITIC CELLS-BASED IMMUNOTHERAPY OF TUMORS USING COMBINATION THERAPY | [2004/25] | French: | PROCEDE D'IMMUNOTHERAPIE A BASE DE CELLULES DENDRITIQUES DE TUMEURS UTILISANT UNE POLYTHERAPIE | [2004/25] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2003 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 02.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 10.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - BORGES L ET AL, "Synergistic action of fms-like tyrosine kinase 3 ligand and CD40 ligand in the induction of dendritic cells and generation of antitumor immunity in vivo.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD.: 1950) UNITED STATES 1 AUG 1999, (19990801), vol. 163, no. 3, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1289 - 1297, XP002223474 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - BANCHEREAU J ET AL, "IMMUNOBIOLOGY OF DENDRITIC CELLS", ANNUAL REVIEW OF IMMUNOLOGY, ANNUAL REVIEWS INC, US, (2000), vol. 18, ISSN 0732-0582, pages 767 - 811, XP001018258 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.immunol.18.1.767 | Examination | - CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, (20001001), vol. 12, page 589-596, XP004257727 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0952-7915(00)00147-3 | - CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 193, pages 48 - 58 |