EP1415107 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A PHOTOLUMINESCENT MATERIAL AND THE MATERIAL THUS OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armony Signalétique Société à responsabilité limitée R.N. 75, Z.A.E. de Juyères 01150 Vaux en Bugey / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Armony Signaletique S.A.R.L. R.N. 75, Z.A.E. de Juyères 01150 Vaux en Bugey / FR | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Armony Signaletique S.A.R.L. R.N. 75, Z.A.E. de Juyères 01150 Vaux en Bugey / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELAUNAY, Thierry Baix F-38118 SAINTE BAUDILLE DE LA TOUR / FR | [2004/24] |
Former [2004/19] | 01 /
DELAUNAY, Thierry Bourchanin, Quirieu F-38390 Bouvesse-Quirieu / FR | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 8, Avenue Pierre Mendès France 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 01274341.5 | 06.07.2001 | [2004/19] | WO2001FR02182 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004928 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415107 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415107 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1415107 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F21K2/00, C09K11/02 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
C09K11/02 (EP);
C09K11/08 (EP);
F21K2/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PHOTOLUMINESZENTEN MATERIALS UND SO ERHALTENES MATERIAL | [2004/19] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A PHOTOLUMINESCENT MATERIAL AND THE MATERIAL THUS OBTAINED | [2004/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MATERIAU PHOTOLUMINESCENT ET LE MATERIAU OBTENU | [2007/34] |
Former [2004/19] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MATERIAU PHOTOLUMISCENT ET LE MATERIAU OBTENU | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 06.02.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.09.2007 | CY | 12.09.2007 | DK | 12.09.2007 | FI | 12.09.2007 | IE | 12.09.2007 | NL | 12.09.2007 | TR | 12.09.2007 | SE | 12.12.2007 | GR | 13.12.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
CY | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
IE | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 12.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10250006 ; | [A]BE868269 (SIGNALISATION TECH S A) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US5374377 (NGUYEN BACH T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * column W *; | [X]WO9927294 (LUNA TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US6123871 (CARROLL MICHAEL LEE [US]) [A] 1-3,8* column W *; | [A]US6207077 (BURNELL-JONES PETER [AU]) [A] 1-3,8 * column W * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10250006 A 19980922 (MITSUBISHI CHEM MKV CO) [X] 1-4,8 * abstract * |