EP1350328 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INTERSYMBOL INTERFERENCE COMPENSATION IN SPREAD SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2 Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Ericsson Inc. 511 Davis Drive Research Triangle Park, N.C. 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOTTOMLEY, Gregory, Edward 100 Merlot Court Cary, NC 27511 / US | 02 /
OTTOSSON, Tony Doktor Bex gata 7B S-413 24 Gothenburg / SE | 03 /
WANG, Yi-Pin, Eric 215 Cedarpost Drive Cary, NC 27513 / US | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/41] | Lundqvist, Alida Maria Therése Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 171 92 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01274492.6 | 19.12.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001US49165 | Priority number, date | US20010756504 | 08.01.2001 Original published format: US 756504 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03026145 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1350328 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/00 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
H04L25/03305 (EP,US);
H04B2201/709727 (EP,US);
H04L25/03299 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZWISCHENSYMBOLSTÖRUNGSKOMPENSATION BEI DER SPREIZSPEKTRUMKOMMUNIKATION | [2003/41] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INTERSYMBOL INTERFERENCE COMPENSATION IN SPREAD SPECTRUM COMMUNICATIONS | [2003/41] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE COMPENSATION DU BROUILLAGE INTER-SYMBOLES DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS A SPECTRE ETALE | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.11.2015 | 23.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/15] | 23.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.12.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5483557 (WEBB WILLIAM T [GB]) [A] 1-75 * column A * * column 2, line 25 - line 58 * * column 4, line 1 - line 38 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 22 * * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 12 *; | [A]US5889827 (BOTTOMLEY GREGORY E [US], et al) [A] 1-75 * column 1, line 18 - line 25 * * column 1, line 34 - line 50 * * column 2, line 11 - line 27 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, line 10 - line 16 * * column 4, line 31 - line 63 * * column 5, line 1 - line 13 * * column 5, line 28 - line 49 * * column 6, line 17 - line 30 * * column 8, line 18 - line 35 * * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 13 * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 10 * * claims 1-3. *; | [A]EP1065793 (INTERSIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-75 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045]; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US5966415 (BLISS WILLIAM G [US], et al) [A] 1,17,20,25,32,47,50,55,62,68,72,74 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 51 - line 63 *; | [A]US6148023 (PELIN PER [SE], et al) [A] 1-75 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - line 59 * * column 11, line 12 - line 48 * * column 12, line 1 - line 26 * | Examination | - WUYTS K.; MOENECLAEY H., "A Reduced Complexity RAKE Receiver with Decision Feedback Equalization for DS/SS Communication over Multipath Fading Channel", PROCEEDINGS IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS ICC 95, SEATTLE, WA, USA, 18-22 JUNE 1995, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950618), vol. 3, pages 1359 - 1363, XP000534986 | - UNGERBOECK G., "Adaptive Maximum-likelihood Receiver for Carrier-modulated Data-transmission Systems", EEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (197405), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 624 - 636, XP000670408 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1974.1092267 | - ADACHI F ET AL, "WIDEBAND DS-CDMA FOR NEXT-GENERATION MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (19980901), vol. 36, no. 9, doi:10.1109/35.714618, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 56 - 69, XP000784827 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.714618 | - BOTTOMLEY G E ET AL, "A generalized RAKE receiver for interference suppression", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20000801), vol. 18, no. 8, doi:10.1109/49.864017, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 1536 - 1545, XP011450067 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.864017 |