EP1450481 - DEMODULATOR AND RECEIVER USING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | For all designated states Sony Deutschland GmbH Hugo-Eckener-Strasse 20 50829 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sony Deutschland GmbH Hugo-Eckener-Strasse 20 50829 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sony International (Europe) GmbH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Masayoshi, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
SASHO, Noboru, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
KRUPEZEVIC, Dragan, c/o SONY INT. (EUROPE) GMBH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | 04 /
BRANKOVIC, Veselin, c/o SONY INT. (EUROPE) GMBH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | 05 /
RATNI, Mohamed, c/o SONY INT. (EUROPE) GMBH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01274895.0 | 30.11.2001 | [2004/35] | WO2001JP10471 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03049276 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450481 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03D9/00, H03D5/00, H04B1/30 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
H03D3/007 (EP,US);
H04B1/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEMODULATOR UND EMPFÄNGER DAMIT | [2004/35] | English: | DEMODULATOR AND RECEIVER USING IT | [2004/35] | French: | DEMODULATEUR ET RECEPTEUR LE METTANT EN APPLICATION | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2003 | Translation filed | 29.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 22.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/48] | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1061660 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-185 * page 4, line 32 - line 51; figures 2,5,6 *; | [A]WO0072441 (LEVEL ONE COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-185 * page 5, line 25 - page 9, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0884836 (UNITED KINGDOM GOVERNMENT [CA]) [A] 1-185 * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 57; figure 5 * | International search | [A]JP2000183994 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH, et al); | [A]JP2000196693 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH, et al); | [A]JP2001016288 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH); | [A]JP2001060982 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH, et al); | [A]JPH10247953 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH1056394 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD) |