EP1418383 - FUEL DISTRIBUTION DEVICE FOR FUEL FEED DUCTS, AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE DISTRIBUTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BABCOCK-HITACHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA World Trade Center Bldg., 4-1, Hamamatsuchou 2-chome Miinatoku Tokyo 105-6107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states BABCOCK-HITACHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA World Trade Center Bldg., 4-1, Hamamatsuchou 2-chome Miinatoku, Tokyo 105-6107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTANI, Y., c/o Babcock-Hitachi K.K. Kure Research Lab., 3-36, Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737-8508 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIZAKO, Hidehisa, c/o Babcock-Hitachi K.K. Kure Research Lab., 3-36, Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737-8508 / JP | 03 /
KANEMOTO, Hiroaki, c/oBabcock-Hitachi K.K. Kure Research Lab., 3-36, Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737-8508 / JP | 04 /
TAKENO, Y., c/o Babcock-Hitachi K.K. Kure Research Lab., 3-36, Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737-8508 / JP | 05 /
SHIMOGORI, Yoshio, c/o Babcock-Hitachi K. K. Kure Division, 6-9, Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737-8508 / JP | 06 /
TSUMURA, Toshikazu, c/o Babcock-Hitachi K. K. Kure Division, 6-9, Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737-8508 / JP | 07 /
TAKAHASHI, Yoshitaka, c/o Babcock-Hitachi K. K. Kure Division, 6-9, Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737-8508 / JP | 08 /
SAKAI, Kazuhito c/o Babcock-Hitachi K. K. Kure Division, 6-9, Takara-machi Kure-shi, Hiroshima 737-8508 / JP | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Peter David George, et al Novagraaf UK 12 Meridian Way Meridian Business Park Norwich NR7 0TA / GB | [2012/24] |
Former [2011/26] | Harrison, Paul Richard, et al Novagraaf Norwich 12 Meridian Way Meridian Business Park Norwich NR7 0TA / GB | ||
Former [2004/20] | Wilson, Peter, et al Novagraaf Patents Limited, The Crescent, 54 Blossom Street York YO24 1AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01274902.4 | 03.12.2001 | [2004/20] | WO2001JP10542 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03048643 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1418383 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F23K3/02 | [2004/20] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 31.10.2003 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFVERTEILVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNSTOFFZUFUHRKANÄLE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN DER VERTEILVORRICHTUNG | [2004/20] | English: | FUEL DISTRIBUTION DEVICE FOR FUEL FEED DUCTS, AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE DISTRIBUTION DEVICE | [2004/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE CARBURANT POUR CONDUITES D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT ET PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER CE DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2003 | Translation filed | 31.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 22.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2941518 (FIRL ARTHUR C) [Y] 14,15 * figures 8,12 * * column 15, line 16 - line 37 *; | [Y]JPS60114621 (ISOBE TEKKO KK) [Y] 7,8 * abstract *; | [X]DE3810320 (BABCOCK WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,11 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]DE4106050 (VER ENERGIEWERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,12,13 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 11 * [Y] 7-11,14,15; | [Y]DE19604993 (LENTJES KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * column 3, line 4 - line 44 * * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US5685240 (BRIGGS JR OLIVER G [US], et al) [Y] 11,14,15 * column 4, line 16 - line 48 *; | [X]DE19708331 (CONRADS HANS GEORG DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * column 1, paragraph 1 ** column 3, line 6 - line 32 *; | [X]US6186079 (WARK RICKEY E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 43 - line 64 * * column 4, line 21 - line 58 *; | [X]CA2328523 (SURE ALLOY STEEL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * page 4, line 9 - line 21 *; | [X]WO0181830 (LEVY EDWARD KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10,12,13 * page 4, line 18 - line 29 * * page 9, line 16 - line 21 * * page 10, line 18 - line 26 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 16 * | International search | [Y]JPS6263545U ; | [X]JPS6270236U ; | [Y]JPH07103452 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) |