EP1482906 - ASTRINGENT SUBSTANCES AS SUN PROTECTION PRODUCTS, ESPECIALLY FOR PROTECTING AGAINST THE UV RADIATION AND INFRARED RADIATION OF SUNLIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEBER, Gerhard, Prof.Dr. Lempenmühle D-96172 Mühlhausen / DE | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Hübner, Gerd, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Hübner, Gerd, Dipl.-Phys., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01274941.2 | 15.11.2001 | [2004/50] | WO2001EP13201 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03049714 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1482906 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/40, A61K7/42 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP);
A61K8/365 (EP);
A61K8/97 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADSTRINGIERENDE SUBSTANZEN ALS SONNENSCHUTZMITTEL, INSBESONDERE GEGEN UV-STRAHLUNG UND INFRAROTSTRAHLUNG DES SONNENLICHTES | [2004/50] | English: | ASTRINGENT SUBSTANCES AS SUN PROTECTION PRODUCTS, ESPECIALLY FOR PROTECTING AGAINST THE UV RADIATION AND INFRARED RADIATION OF SUNLIGHT | [2004/50] | French: | SUBSTANCES ASTRINGENTES SERVANT DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE, EN PARTICULIER CONTRE LES RAYONNEMENTS ULTRAVIOLETS ET INFRAROUGES DE LA LUMIERE SOLAIRE | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.10.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | 02.10.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.10.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   02.10.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 15.06.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2004 | 30.11.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS61109708 ; | [X]US5747010 (GEESIN JEFFREY C [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 6, line 58 - line 67; claims 1,9,11 *; | [X]US5169624 (ZIEGLER PHILIP D [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 7, line 24 - line 48; claim 1 *; | [DX]US5804168 (MURAD HOWARD [US]) [DX] 1-6 * column 6, line 21 - line 29; claims 1,3,15,16 *; | [DX]JPH1087469 ; | [PX]DE10026571 (WEBER GERHARD [DE]) [PX] 1-6 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861003), vol. 010, no. 292, Database accession no. (C - 376), & JP61109708 A 19860528 (KOBAYASHI KOOC:KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10087469 A 19980407 (ICHIMARU PHARCOS CO LTD) [DX] 1-6 * abstract * |