Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1463897
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.03.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] |
31.01.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.11.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.08.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.04.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.04.2005 |
First examination report |
|
18.03.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
11.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
11.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
28.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] |
20.08.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
20.08.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
06.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|