EP1118912 - Developing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyabe, Shigeo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Toba, Shinjiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tsuda, Tadayuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/30] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300381.9 | 17.01.2001 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | JP20000009015 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000009015 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118912 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1118912 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/09 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
G03G21/1871 (EP,US);
G03G15/0935 (EP,US);
G03G21/1652 (EP,US);
G03G21/1676 (EP,US);
G03G2221/166 (EP,US);
G03G2221/183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2006/39] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Entwicklungsgerät | [2001/30] | English: | Developing apparatus | [2001/30] | French: | Appareil de développement | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0754984 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,7,16,20,21,23,25 * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 39; figures 3,4 * [Y] 2,3,5,8,9,11,12,14,19,22,24; | [Y]JPH0572955 ; | [A]EP0959391 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 19,22 * figure - *; | [A]US4839690 (ONODA SHIGEYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * column W * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930727), vol. 017, no. 402, Database accession no. (P - 1580), & JP05072955 A 19930326 (CANON INC) [Y] 2,3,5,8,9,11,12,14,19,22,24 * abstract * |