EP1126606 - Active inductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | ||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sackinger, Eduard 326 Crawford Street Shrewsbury, New Jersey 07724 / US | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/40] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/15] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2001/34] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300507.9 | 22.01.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | US20000498559 | 04.02.2000 Original published format: US 498559 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1126606 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1126606 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/48 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
H03H11/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/14] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Aktive Induktanz | [2001/34] | English: | Active inductor | [2001/34] | French: | Inductance active | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 21.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/23] | Appeal following examination | 27.07.2012 | Appeal received No. T2297/12 | 25.09.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.06.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | DE FR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5672992 (NADD BRUNO C [FR]) [A] 13,15 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 16 ** claims 1,3 *; | [XY] - JIN-SO KO ET AL, "Low power, tunable active inductor and its applications to monolithic VCO and BPF", MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, 1997., IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL DENVER, CO, USA 8-13 JUNE 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970608), ISBN 0-7803-3814-6, pages 929 - 932, XP010228533 [X] 1-12,14,16-19 * page 929, column L, line 1 - page 930, column L, line 7 * * figure 1 * [Y] 13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.1997.602952 | [Y] - DUNN W, Driving and protection of high side NMOS power switches, CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING. SEATTLE, OCT. 7 - 12, 1990, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, VOL. VOL. 2 MEETING 25, PAGE(S) 1626-1630, ISBN 0-87942-553-9, XP010034988 [Y] 13,15 * page 1626 - page 1628, column L, line 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.1990.152404 | Examination | - EPANORAMA.NET, "GYRATOR CIRCUIT: SIMULATE LARGE COILS ELECTRONICALLY", INTERNET CITATION, (20170421), page 1, URL: HTTP://WWW.EPANORAMA.NET/DOCUMENTS/TELECOM/GYRATOR.HTML, (20170421), XP055388939 | - AHMED H.; SPREADBURY P., "ELECTRONICS FOR ENGINEERS - AN INTRODUCTION", INTERNET CITATION, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (19730101), pages 218 - 219, XP055388943 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1351/pac199668091809 | - ANONYMOUS, "GYRATOR", WIKIPEDIA, INTERNET CITATION, (20040227), URL: HTTPS://EN.WIKIPEDIA.ORG/WIKI/GYRATOR, (20170707), XP055388947 | - "A NOVEL APPROACH FOR GENERATING ACTIVE INDUCTORS FOR MICROWAVE OSCILLATORS - MATHEMATICAL TREATMENT AND EXPERIMENTAL VERIFICATION OF ACTIVE INDUCTORS FOR MICROWAVE APPLICATIONS", ULRICH L. ROHDE, EXTRA PAGES 157-158, TECHNISCHE UNIVERSITÄT COTTBUS, (20111214), pages 137 - 138, XP055388955 |