EP1125580 - Methods of treating diabetic cardiomyopathy using glycogen phosphorylase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Treadway, Judith Lee Pfizer Global and Dev., Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Wood, David John, et al Pfizer Limited European Patents Department, Ramsgate Road, Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, European Patents Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300575.6 | 23.01.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | US20000177770P | 24.01.2000 Original published format: US 177770 P | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1125580 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1125580 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/404, A61K31/4439, A61K31/454, A61K31/407, A61K31/427, A61K31/695, A61K31/5377, A61K31/496, A61K31/5355, A61P9/02, A61P9/10 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045 (KR);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/407 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/443 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/5355 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/695 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/02 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/42 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von diabetischer Herzmyopathie mit Glykogen Phosphorylaseinhibitoren | [2001/34] | English: | Methods of treating diabetic cardiomyopathy using glycogen phosphorylase inhibitors | [2001/34] | French: | Méthodes de traitement de la cardiomyopathie diabétique avec des inhibiteurs de la phosphorylase du glycogène | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 19.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 26.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/52] | Request for further processing for: | 27.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO9639385 (PFIZER [US], et al) [DX] 1-15 * claims 1-38 *; | [DX]WO9639384 (PFIZER [US], et al) [DX] 1-15 * claims 1-57 *; | [X]WO9926659 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 92, line 10 - line 28; claims 1-53 *; | [PX]EP0978279 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [PX] 1-15 * claims 1-17 *; | [E]EP1088824 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [E] 1-15 * claims 1-15 *; | [E]WO0168092 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * claims 1-70 *; | [E]WO0168055 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * claims 1-66 *; | [E]WO0220530 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [E] 1-15 * claims 1-9 *; | [X] - MARTIN ET AL, "Discovery of a human liver glycogen phosphorylase inhibitor that lowers blood glucose in vivo", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199802), vol. 95, no. 4, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1776 - 1781, XP002122959 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.4.1776 | [DX] - HOOVER ET AL, "Indole-2-carboxamide inhibitors of human liver glycogen phosphorylase", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1998), vol. 41, no. 16, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2934 - 2938, XP002122958 [DX] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm980264k |