EP1122263 - Styrene-maleic anhydride resin amic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATOFINA CHEMICALS, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103-3222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Atofina Chemicals, Inc. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103-3222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidhauser, John C. 74 Jolind Road Paoli, Pennsylvania 19301 / US | 02 /
Hahn, Lisa M. 2246 South Hamilton Road Columbus, Ohio 43232 / US | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2001/32] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300780.2 | 30.01.2001 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | US20000496472 | 02.02.2000 Original published format: US 496472 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1122263 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/32, C09D11/10 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
C09D11/106 (EP,US);
C08F8/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/18] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Amidsäuren auf Basis von Harzen aus Styrol und Maleinsäureanhydrid | [2001/32] | English: | Styrene-maleic anhydride resin amic acids | [2001/32] | French: | Acides amiques à base de résines styrène-anhydride maléique | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 21.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 06.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.04.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   25.04.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04139271 ; | [Y]DE3225876 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 10 * * page 10, line 31 - line 34 * * page 11, line 13 - line 28 * * page 12, line 24 - line 34; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0543385 (DYES JOACHIM LACKFAB GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, line 40 - line 53 * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 1; claims 1-9 *; | [Y]EP0042974 (KAPP WERNER) [Y] 1-11 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 2; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0425439 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 50 - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 16 - line 30 * * column 5, line 12 - line 22; claims 1-15 *; | [A]GB1268418 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 3, line 98 - line 116; claims 1-29 *; | [A]WO9849143 (ISP INVESTMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 1; claims 1-12 *; | [A]US3053779 (O'NEILL WILLIAM O) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1004644 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1 * claims 1-5 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 26, Database accession no. 1992-212107, XP002167865 & JPH04139271 A 19920513 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * |