EP1126294 - Optical configuration for a dynamic gain equalizer and a configurable add/drop multiplexer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JDS Uniphase Inc. 570 West Hunt Club Road Nepean Ontario K2G 5W8 / CA | [2006/21] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states JDS Uniphase Inc. 570 West Hunt Club Road Nepean, Ontario K2G 5W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouevitch, Oleg 2336 Shanegal Crescent Gloucester, Ontario K1V 9P2 / CA | 02 /
Ducellier, Thomas 415 Besserer Street Ottawa, Ontario K1N 6B9 / CA | 03 /
Tomlinson, John W. Unit 1, 68 Lovers Lane Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | 04 /
Colbourne, Paul 6 Bren-Maur Road Nepean, Ontario K2J 3Z7 / CA | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | McKechnie, Neil Henry, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | McKechnie, Neil Henry, et al Kennedys Patent Agency Limited Floor 4, Queens House 29 St Vincent Place Glasgow G1 2DT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301296.8 | 13.02.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | US20000183155P | 17.02.2000 Original published format: US 183155 P | US20000729270P | 05.12.2000 Original published format: US 729270 P | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1126294 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1126294 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1126294 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/293, G02B6/34, G02B6/35, G02F1/31 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
G02B6/29383 (EP,US);
G02B6/2766 (EP,US);
G02B6/2773 (EP,US);
G02B6/2793 (EP,US);
G02B6/2931 (EP,US);
G02B6/29313 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/34] | G02B6/293 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/49] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optische Konfiguration für einen dynamischen Verstärkungsequalisator und konfigurierbarer Einfüge-/Ausblende-Multiplexer | [2006/03] | English: | Optical configuration for a dynamic gain equalizer and a configurable add/drop multiplexer | [2001/34] | French: | Configuration optique pour un égalisateur de gain dynamique et multiplexeur à insertion/extraction configurable | [2001/34] |
Former [2001/34] | Optische Konfiguration fur einen dynamischen Verstärkungsequalisator und konfigurierbarer Einfüge-/Ausblende-Multiplexer | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 13.09.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 20.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5745271 (FORD JOSEPH EARL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-12 * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 24; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5,8; | [Y]WO9938348 (TELLIUM INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 14; figures 2,5 *; | [Y]EP0859249 (PHOTONETICS [FR]) [Y] 4,5 * column 8, line 24 - line 55; figures 8,9 *; | [Y]US5499307 (IWATSUKA SHINJI [JP]) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 21 - line 26 * * column 4, line 39 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5999672 (HUNTER BOYD V [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 31; figure 13 *; | [A]EP0947865 (JDS FITEL INC [CA]) [A] 10-12 * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 29; figures 1,,2A,,2B *; | [A]US5740288 (PAN JING-JONG [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0654917 (AT & T CORP [US]) [AD] 1-12 * column 8, line 6 - column 10, line 21; figures 2,3,6 *; | [A]US5917625 (OGUSU MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-3,5,6,19,22,26,27,30 *; | [PXY]US6097859 (SOLGAARD OLAV [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,6,7,9 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 8; figures 1,6 * [Y] 4,5,8,10-12 | [XY] - FORD J E ET AL, "WAVELENGTH ADD-DROP SWITCHING USING TILTING MICROMIRRORS", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (199905), vol. 17, no. 5, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 904 - 911, XP002947083 [X] 1-3,6,7,9-12 * page 904, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 905, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 3A * [Y] 4,5,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.762910 | [A] - MCKNIGHT S W ET AL, "WAVELENGTH DEPENDENCE OF PERSISTENT PHOTOCONDUCTIVITY IN INDIUM-DOPED PB1-XSNXTE", SEMICONDUCTOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. LONDON, GB, (19900301), vol. 5, no. 3-S, ISSN 0268-1242, pages S155 - 158, XP000127209 [A] 1-12 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0268-1242/5/3S/034 |