EP1132571 - Method and apparatus for frac/gravel packs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. P.O. Box 1431 Duncan, Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dusterhoft, Ronald G. 1902 Crescent Common Dr. Katy, Texas 77494 / US | 02 /
Hailey, Travis T. Jr. 3902 Lyndhurst Place, Sugar Land Texas 77479 / US | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301372.7 | 16.02.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | US20000520305 | 07.03.2000 Original published format: US 520305 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1132571 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/267, E21B43/04, E21B34/06 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
E21B43/025 (EP,US);
E21B34/06 (EP,US);
E21B43/04 (EP,US);
E21B43/10 (EP,US);
E21B43/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/23] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Frac- und Filterkiesbehandlung | [2001/37] | English: | Method and apparatus for frac/gravel packs | [2001/37] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la fracturation et installation de filtre à gravier | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 31.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5333688 (JONES LLOYD G [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-9,11,13 * column 2, lines 57-68; figures 1-4 * * column 3, lines 29-36 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 4 * [A] 16,23,35; | [X]US5890533 (JONES LLOYD G [US]) [X] 1,4 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO9533915 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1,4 * figures 5,6 *; | [X]US5435391 (JONES LLOYD G [US]) [X] 1,4 * figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US4474239 (COLOMB GLENN T [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * figures 2-4 * [A] 5; | [A]US5597040 (STOUT GREGG W [US], et al) [A] 1,11,16,23,35 * figures 4-9 *; | [A]EP0421822 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-11 *; | [E]WO0114691 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US], et al) [E] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US5934376 | US6003600 | EP0909874 | EP0909875 | US591318 | US19990399674 |