EP1134723 - Game device with control method and game distribution method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Corporation 4-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states KCE Tokyo Inc. 3-25, Kanda Jimbo-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/36] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Konami Corporation 4-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states KCE Tokyo Inc. 3-25, Kanda Jimbo-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Konami Corporation 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states KCE Tokyo Inc. 3-25, Kanda Jimbo-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nobe, Kazuhiko c/o KCE Tokyo Inc., 3-25 Kanda Jimbo-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kuraishi, Hidetoshi c/o KCE Tokyo Inc., 3-25 Kanda Jimbo-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Pluckrose, Anthony William, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301385.9 | 16.02.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | JP20000038876 | 16.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000038876 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134723 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134723 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1134723 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
A63F13/35 (EP);
A63F13/5375 (EP,KR);
A63F13/77 (US);
A63F13/44 (EP,US);
A63F13/533 (EP,KR);
A63F13/63 (EP,US);
A63F13/65 (EP);
A63F13/814 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/95 (EP,US);
G10H1/0008 (EP,US);
G10H1/0058 (EP,US);
G10H1/40 (EP,US);
A63F13/335 (EP);
A63F13/338 (EP);
A63F13/46 (EP);
A63F2003/00129 (EP,US);
A63F2300/206 (EP);
A63F2300/305 (EP);
A63F2300/308 (EP);
A63F2300/407 (EP);
A63F2300/409 (EP);
A63F2300/50 (EP);
A63F2300/552 (EP,US);
A63F2300/6018 (EP);
A63F2300/61 (EP);
A63F2300/638 (EP,US);
A63F2300/69 (EP);
A63F2300/8047 (EP,US);
G10H2220/141 (EP,US);
G10H2230/015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/42] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Spielvorrichtung mit Steuerungsverfahren und Verfahren zur Spielverteilung | [2001/38] | English: | Game device with control method and game distribution method | [2001/38] | French: | Dispositif de jeu avec méthode de commande et méthode de distribution de jeu | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0417574 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8,11 * column 1, line 31 - line 52 * * column 9, line 3 - column 13, line 13 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]EP0823270 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,11 * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 7 * * page 10, line 24 - line 44 * * page 14, line 43 - line 50 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 9,10; | [YA]US5735744 (OKAMOTO TAKEYA [JP]) [Y] 9,10 * column 1, line 49 - line 53 * * column 2, line 8 - line 17 * * column 3, line 54 - line 63 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 7,8; | [A]US5857856 (AZUMA TETSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 9,10 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 53 ** column 10, line 35 - line 47 * |