EP1128402 - Magnetic device employing a winding structure spanning multiple boards and method of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busletta, Galliano R. 3704 Poteet Drive, Apartment 828 Mesquite, Texas 75150 / US | 02 /
Roessler, Robert J. 6905 Graham Drive Rowlett, Texas 75088 / US | 03 /
Wilkowski, Matthew A. 2339 Heatherdale Drive Mesquite, Texas 75150 / US | 04 /
Woods, William L. Jr. 9453 County Road 133 Kaufman, Texas 75142 / US | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301435.2 | 19.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | US20000514822 | 28.02.2000 Original published format: US 514822 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1128402 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/28 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
H01F27/2804 (EP,US);
H05K1/141 (EP,US);
H05K1/165 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/21] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Magnetische Vorrichtung mit einer Wicklungsanordnung, gespannt in multiple Leiterplatten, sowie Herstellungsverfahren | [2001/35] | English: | Magnetic device employing a winding structure spanning multiple boards and method of manufacture thereof | [2001/35] | French: | Dispositif magnétique utilisant une structure d'enroulement dans plusieurs circuits imprimés et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 14.11.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4622627 (RODRIGUEZ EDWARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5990776 (JITARU IONEL [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 40; figures 1-3B * |