EP1130580 - Optical disk device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokoyama, Eiji, c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha, 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Ryu, Tomoaki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha, 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301476.6 | 20.02.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | JP20000055447 | 01.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000055447 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130580 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130580 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130580 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
G11B7/0948 (EP,US);
G11B19/02 (KR);
G11B7/0953 (EP,US);
G11B7/0956 (EP,US);
G11B20/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Plattengerät | [2001/36] | English: | Optical disk device | [2001/36] | French: | Dispositif de disque optique | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 02.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4406000 (SHOJI ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4587644 (FUJIIE KAZUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US6172953 (KAMIYAMA HIDEYO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US6052348 (BELSER KARL A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0814462 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |