EP1127900 - Polymer and photoresist compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shipley Company LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2001/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szmanda, Charles R. 4 Crossman Avenue Westborough, Massachusetts 01581 / US | 02 /
Barclay, George G. 1566 Main Street Jefferson, Massachusetts 01522 / US | 03 /
Trefonas, Peter 40 Summerhill Road Medway, Massachusetts 02053 / US | 04 /
Yueh, Wang 22 Farmington Drive Shrewsbury, Massachusetts 01545 / US | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2001/35] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Operations Patent Dept. Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301598.7 | 22.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | US20000511726 | 24.02.2000 Original published format: US 511726 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127900 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127900 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08F32/08, G03F7/039, G03F7/004 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
G03F7/0395 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (KR);
C08F32/08 (EP,US);
G03F7/0045 (EP,US);
G03F7/039 (EP,US);
G03F7/0397 (EP,US);
Y10S430/108 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2002/21] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Polymer und Photoresistzusammensetzungen | [2001/35] | English: | Polymer and photoresist compositions | [2001/35] | French: | Polymère et compositions pour photoréserves | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 12.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.04.2005 | NL | 27.04.2005 | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/22] | NL | 27.04.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0492982 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]); | [DA]WO9942510 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) |