Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1237085 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2004 | B1 | EP1237085 | 04.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01301713 | 26.02.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE284060T | 15.12.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP01301713 | 26.02.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60107532T | 15.12.2005 | T2 | DE60107532D1 | 05.01.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP01301713 | 26.02.2001 |