EP1143745 - Image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/33] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yui, Hideaki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301773.6 | 27.02.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | JP20000052992 | 29.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000052992 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143745 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143745 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143745 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/75 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
G09G5/14 (EP,US);
H04N9/74 (KR);
G09G5/397 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4318 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/4435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4438 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/641 (EP,US);
H04N9/75 (EP,US);
G09G2340/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/50] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2001/41] | English: | Image processing apparatus | [2001/41] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'image | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/12] | NL | 13.08.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5220312 (LUMELSKY LEON [US], et al) [A] 1,7-10,12,16,18-21 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 43 - line 53 * * claim 5 * * figures 3,4,6 *; | [A]US5398075 (FREYTAG LAWRENCE K [US], et al) [A] 1,10,12,18-21 * column 5, line 32 - line 47 * * column 1, line 55 - line 68 * * claim 1 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US4811084 (BELMARES-SARABIA ARMAND [US], et al) [A] 1,12,19-21 * column 2, line 3 - line 8 * * column 11, line 49 - column 12, line 6 * * figure 1 *; | [A]JPH11313339 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11313339 A 19991109 (TOSHIBA CORP; TOSHIBA COMPUT ENG CORP) [A] 1,12,19-21 * abstract * |