EP1191078 - Ink composition for ink-jet printers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-3 Dong, Paldal-ku Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 441-373 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryu, Seung-min 612-2002 Ulji Apt., 1145-14 Kwangjung-dong Kunpo-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Jang, Seung-soon 10-108 Shillimbon-dong Kwanak-gu / KR | 03 /
Cha, Jun-hoe (B-103) 235-10 Jeongja-dong, Pubdang-gu Seongnam-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Brierley, Anthony Paul Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Brierley, Anthony Paul Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301847.8 | 28.02.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | KR20000055198 | 20.09.2000 Original published format: KR 2000055198 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191078 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1191078 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191078 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
C09D11/38 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/30] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Tintenzusammensetzung für den Tintenstrahldruck | [2002/13] | English: | Ink composition for ink-jet printers | [2002/13] | French: | Composition d'encre pour imprimantes à jet d'encre | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2001 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4365998 (SUGIYAMA MASATOSHI, et al) [X] 1,3-6 * column 4, lines 50-55 * * column 5, lines 49-68 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 12 * * Formula 5;; example 6 *; | [X]GB2088777 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5,6,8 * page 2, line 10 - page 6, line 24 * * page 23, lines 38-51 * * Formula V-1 *; | [X]JPS59223766 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 05, Database accession no. 1985-028525, XP002252509 & JPS59223766 A 19841215 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |