Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] |
25.07.2008 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
25.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
04.07.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
04.07.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
21.03.2008 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
26.01.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.02.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.12.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
28.07.2006 | First examination report | |
25.07.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
02.02.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.02.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.09.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
28.09.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
04.06.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] |
31.01.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.09.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] |
29.01.2003 | Renewal fee | |
08.02.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] |
08.02.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] |