EP1197262 - Method and apparatus for manufacturing microspheres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN as represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF NATIONAL FOOD RESEARCH INSTITUTE, MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY AND FISHERIES 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305 / JP | For all designated states Bio-oriented Technology Research Advancement Institution Toranomon Marine Bldg., 10th Floor, 18-9, Toranomon 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states JAPAN as represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF NATIONAL FOOD RESEARCH INSTITUTE, MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY AND FISHERIES 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305 / JP | ||
For all designated states Bio-oriented Technology Research Advancement Institution Toranomon Marine Bldg., 10th Floor, 18-9, Toranomon 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states JAPAN as represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF NATIONAL FOOD RESEARCH INSTITUTE, MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY AND FISHERIES 2-1-2, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | ||
For all designated states Bio-oriented Technology Research Advancement Institution Toranomon Marine Bldg., 10th Floor, 18-9, Toranomon 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Mitsutoshi 7-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Fujita, Hiroyuku 9-14, Senkawa 1-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kikuchi, Yuji 1-10-2-506, Kubodai 4-chome Ryugasaki-shi Ibaraki / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Isao 1016-11, Shimomurota Ohaza Haruna-machi Gunma-gun Gunma / JP | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301870.0 | 01.03.2001 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | JP20000313577 | 13.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000313577 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1197262 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1197262 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197262 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/04, B01J19/00, B01J4/04, B01J19/24 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
B01J13/04 (EP,US);
B01F33/30 (EP,US);
B01F23/41 (EP,US);
B01F25/3142 (EP,US);
B01F25/31425 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/42] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren sowie Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Mikrosphären | [2002/16] | English: | Method and apparatus for manufacturing microspheres | [2002/16] | French: | Procédé et Dispositif pour la préparation de microsphères | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2003 | 05.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2003 | 28.07.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2003 | 05.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2003 | 05.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.07.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   28.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2339397 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 11, line 9 - page 11, line 18; figures 5-10 * [A] 7-10; | [XA]DE19908171 (NAT FOOD RES [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 19 - column 7, line 5; figures 2-7; claim 1 * [A] 7-10; | [DXA]EP0963787 (JP NATIONAL FOOD RESEARCH INST [JP]) [DX] 1-6 * the whole document * [A] 7-10; | [DA]JPH0295433 ; | [A]WO0059625 (E INK CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 20, Database accession no. 1990-151461, XP002218884 & JPH0295433 A 19900406 (MIYAZAKI KEN) [DA] * abstract * |