EP1137316 - Methods and apparatus for managing communication networks supporting multiple quality of service classes utilizing generalized processor sharing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumaran, Krishnan 257 Spruce Mull Lane Scotch Plains, New Jersey 07076 / US | 02 /
Margrave, Geoffrey Edmund 931 Lilac Lane Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | 03 /
Mitra, Debasis 133 Summit Avenue, Apt. 43 Summit, New Jersey 079091 / US | 04 /
Stanley, Keith R. 29W120 Lost Meadows Lane Warrenville, Illinois 60555 / US | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2001/39] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302251.2 | 12.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | US20000531344 | 21.03.2000 Original published format: US 531344 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1137316 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1137316 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/56 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L45/302 (EP,US);
H04L45/42 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5651 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5679 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/39] | H04Q11/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/41] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verwalten von Kommunikationsnetzen mit verschiedene Dienstqualitätsklassen, mit Verwendung von "generalized processor sharing" | [2001/39] | English: | Methods and apparatus for managing communication networks supporting multiple quality of service classes utilizing generalized processor sharing | [2001/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la gestion de réseaux de communication possédant de multiples classes de qualité de service avec utilisation de la technique "generalized processor sharing" | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 18.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/33] | 29.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP1039699 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PX] 1-12 * the whole document * | [X] - QIU J-Y ET AL, "Inter-class resource sharing using statistical service envelopes", INFOCOM '99. EIGHTEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE NEW YORK, NY, USA 21-25 MARCH 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990321), ISBN 0-7803-5417-6, pages 1404 - 1411, XP010323869 [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [002C] , [0003] , [0004] * | [X] - KUMARAN K ET AL, "Performance and fluid simulations of a novel shared buffer management system", INFOCOM '98. SEVENTEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 29 MARCH-2 APRIL 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980329), ISBN 0-7803-4383-2, pages 1449 - 1461, XP010270365 [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1998.662963 | [DA] - ELWALID A ET AL, "Traffic shaping at a network node: theory, optimum design, admission control", INFOCOM '97. SIXTEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. DRIVING THE INFORMATION REVOLUTION., PROCEEDINGS IEEE KOBE, JAPAN 7-11 APRIL 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970407), ISBN 0-8186-7780-5, pages 444 - 454, XP010252065 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1997.644493 | [PX] - KUMARAN K ET AL, "Novel techniques for the design and control of generalized processor sharing schedulers for multiple QoS classes", INFOCOM 2000. NINETEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE TEL AVIV, ISRAEL 26-30 MARCH 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20000326), ISBN 0-7803-5880-5, pages 932 - 941, XP010376183 [PX] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.2000.832268 |