EP1189422 - System and method for providing lifeline power service to digital subscriber line customers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Posthuma, Carl Robert 1309 Lowden Avenue Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302269.4 | 12.03.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | US20000650050 | 29.08.2000 Original published format: US 650050 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1189422 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1189422 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189422 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04M19/00 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
H04M19/001 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/26] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Leistungsnotdiensten für DSL-Teilnehmern | [2004/07] | English: | System and method for providing lifeline power service to digital subscriber line customers | [2002/12] | French: | Système et procédé de service de téléphonie d'émergence pour abonnées d'une ligne numérique | [2002/12] |
Former [2002/12] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur bereitstellung von Leistungsnotdiensten für DSL-Teilnehmern | Examination procedure | 12.03.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.03.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 28.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 26.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) NL | 23.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6028916 (BEVERIDGE GREGORY J [US]) [X] 1,3,8,11,13 * abstract * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 26 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 50 * * figure 3 *; | [PX]WO0113622 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [PX] 1,3-6,8,11-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 8 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 22 * * page 6, line 25 - line 29 * * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 29 * * page 13, line 5 - line 7 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9921311 (GODIGITAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6,8,11-13 * abstract * * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 10 * * page 6, line 23 - line 36 * * page 7, line 23 - line 36 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5216704 (WILLIAMS ARTHUR B [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6-9,13 * abstract * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 51 - column 7, line 61 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US4853949 (SCHORR IAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7-9,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 62 * * column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 21 * * figure 1 * | Examination | US5883941 | EP0844802 |