EP1143408 - CAPO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G7th Limited 95 Dunsberry Bretton Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE3 8LB / GB | [2005/41] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states G7th Limited 95 Dunsberry Bretton Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE3 8LB / GB | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Campling, Nicholas John 42 Technology, Litton House, Global Business Park, Saville Road Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE3 7PR / GB | ||
For all designated states Lewis, John Brian Richard 42 Technology, Litton House, Global Business Park, Saville Road Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE3 7PR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campling, Nicholas John 95 Dunsberry, Bretton Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE3 8LB / GB | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Richard Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Lamb, Richard Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, New Priestgate House, 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambs. PE1 1JX / GB | ||
Former [2001/41] | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302512.7 | 19.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | GB20000008362 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: GB 0008362 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143408 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143408 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143408 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10D3/04 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
G10D3/053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/41] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kapodaster | [2001/41] | English: | CAPO | [2001/41] | French: | Capodastre | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.2005 | BE | 12.10.2005 | CH | 12.10.2005 | CY | 12.10.2005 | FI | 12.10.2005 | FR | 12.10.2005 | IT | 12.10.2005 | LI | 12.10.2005 | TR | 12.10.2005 | DK | 12.01.2006 | GR | 12.01.2006 | SE | 12.01.2006 | ES | 23.01.2006 | PT | 13.03.2006 | IE | 20.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
IT | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
IE | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
IT | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
IE | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
IE | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
ES | 23.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 12.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4324165 (WILKERSON JAMES W) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,10 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US5492045 (ROBLEE TODD A [US]) [DA] 1-5,8-10 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 30 ** column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 18; figures 2,5,6 *; | [X]US6008441 (STEINBERGER RICHARD NED [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 26 * |