EP1139497 - Electronic interconnect device for high speed signal and data transmission, and adapter usable therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. 14200 S.W. Karl Braun Drive, P.O. Box 500 Beaverton, OR 97077-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Tektronix, Inc. 14200 S.W. Karl Braun Drive, P.O. Box 500 Beaverton, OR 97077-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pooley, William R. 5445 SW 190th Aloha, Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
Ayres, Daniel J. 58341 S. Bachelor Flat Road Warren, Oregon 97053 / US | 03 /
Swafford, M. David 23375 NE Ridge Road Gaston, Oregon 97119 / US | 04 /
Law, William Q. 6465 SW 204th Place Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | 05 /
Kyle, Michael L. 1180 NW 122nd Avenue Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 06 /
Lyford, J. Steven 390 NW Brynwood Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 07 /
Myers, Jonathan E. 928 SE 33rd Portland, Oregon 97214 / US | 08 /
Nightingale, Mark W. 719 - 20th Street Washougal, Washington 98671 / US | 09 /
Shane, Jerry R. 17970 NW Andria Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302543.2 | 20.03.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | US20000193622P | 31.03.2000 Original published format: US 193622 P | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1139497 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1139497 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1139497 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/05, H01R13/187 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
H01R13/187 (EP,US);
H01R13/646 (KR);
H01R9/0515 (EP,US);
H01R13/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/40] | H01R9/05 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/31] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Signalübertragungssystem für Hochgeschwindigkeitsdatenübertragung sowie ein hierfür geeigneter Adapter | [2001/40] | English: | Electronic interconnect device for high speed signal and data transmission, and adapter usable therewith | [2001/40] | French: | Système de transfert de signaux pour le transfert de données à grande vitesse, et adapteur à utiliser avec ledit système | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 24.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03078624.8 / EP1416589 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Request for further processing for: | 13.11.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.12.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4245875 (SHAFFER HOWARD R, et al) [A] 1-73* column 3, line 44 - line 51 *; | [A]US4426127 (KUBOTA JAMES [US]) [A] 1-73 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5234353 (SCHOLZ JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1-73 * column 7, line 51 - line 68 *; | [A]US5857866 (FELPS JIMMIE D [US]) [A] 1-73 * column 6, line 54 - line 58 * |