EP1138573 - Skiing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Podmore, Nicholas Guy Flat 1.01, The School House, Page's Walk London SE1 4HG / GB | [2001/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302581.2 | 20.03.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | GB20000007777 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0007777 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1138573 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B62B13/08 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
B62B13/16 (EP);
B62B13/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schneegleitvorrichtung | [2001/40] | English: | Skiing device | [2001/40] | French: | Engin de glisse sur neige | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 27.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/44] | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9857712 (SMART CARTS INTERNATIONAL [NZ], et al) [A] 1,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE555746 (FRANZ WELS, et al) [A] 1,7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3444428 (PETER FRANZ JOSEF) [A] 1,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]CH545217 (MUGGLI RENE [CH]) [A] 1,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4334691 (SCHEIB RUDI) [A] 1,7,9 * column W * |