EP1243970 - Lithographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110, Building 2 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302647.1 | 22.03.2001 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243970 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
G03F7/70558 (EP);
G03F7/70741 (EP);
G03F7/7085 (EP);
G03F7/70916 (EP);
G03F7/70983 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lithographischer Apparat | [2002/39] | English: | Lithographic apparatus | [2002/39] | French: | Appareil lithographique | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/05] | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2003/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4695732 (WARD RODNEY [GB]) [X] 1,6,8-11 * column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 24 * * column 2, line 36 - line 62 * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 40 * * column 5, line 1 - line 5 * * column 5, line 41 - line 60 * * figure - *; | [XY]EP0987601 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 11 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0059] * * figure 2 * [Y] 1,6,8-10; | [XA]US4983864 (MURAI FUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 11 * column 3, line 7 - line 30 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,10; | [XA]US5567949 (OKINO TERUAKI [JP]) [X] 11 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 16 * * figure 2 * [A] 1,10 | [Y] - J. H. MOORE ET AL., Building Scientific Apparatus, READING, MASSACHUSETTS, US, ADDISON-WESLEY, (1983), XP002177354 [Y] 1,6,8-10 * page 319 - page 322 * |