EP1136593 - A method for renewing diffusion coatings on superalloy substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Aviation Services Operation (Pte) Ltd. No. 23 Loyang Way Singapore 508726 / SG | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Keng Nam Block 151 Tampines Street 12 No. 10-04 Singapore 521151 / SG | 02 /
Ngiam, Shih Tung 62 Jalan Girang Singapore 359231 / SG | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Szary, Anne Catherine London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2001/39] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr. GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302772.7 | 26.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | US20000534512 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: US 534512 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136593 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136593 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C23F1/44, F01D5/00, F01D25/00 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
C23F1/44 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1116 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, LI, NL [2002/24] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erneuerung von Diffusionsschichten auf Superlegierungen | [2001/39] | English: | A method for renewing diffusion coatings on superalloy substrates | [2001/39] | French: | Procédé pour renouveler des couches de diffusion sur des superalliages | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3622391 (BALDI ALFONSO L) [X] 1-3,7-11,13,18 * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 3 * * column 2, lines 1-10 *; | [X]US4327134 (BALDI ALFONSO L) [X] 1-3,7-11,143 * example 3 *; | [A]US5944909 (REEVES JIM D [US], et al) [A] 1,18 * claim 9 *; | [A]US3458353 (BALDI ALFONSO L) [A] 1,18 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5587103 (DENNIS TIMOTHY A [US]) [A] 1,18 * column 4, lines 31-33; claim 1 *; | [A]US4425185 (FISHTER ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1,18 * claim 1 *; | [DA]US5851409 (SCHAEFFER JON C [US], et al) [DA] 1,18 * claim 1 * | Examination | US5976265 |