EP1199799 - Signal compensator circuit and demodulator circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [2006/35] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Akira, Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302828.7 | 27.03.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | JP20000316179 | 17.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000316179 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199799 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199799 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199799 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03K9/02, H03F3/45, H03K5/007 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
H03K5/007 (EP,US);
H03K5/086 (EP,US);
H03K9/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/17] | H03K5/007, H03K5/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/52] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Signalkompensierungsschaltung und Demodulatorschaltung | [2002/17] | English: | Signal compensator circuit and demodulator circuit | [2002/17] | French: | Circuit de compensation de signal et circuit de démodulation | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 01.10.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 31.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5412692 (UCHIDA TETSUROU [JP]) [DA] 1-6 * column 1, lines 32-44 * * column 2, lines 14-30 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 30; figures 4,7 *; | [A]US5557638 (FISHER KEVIN DEAN [NL], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, lines 6-12 * * column 4, lines 12-36 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0736968 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, lines 18-31 * * column 4, lines 43-49 * * column 5, lines 33-41 ** figure 2 *; | [A]US5767751 (MAGNUSSON PER [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 42 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9952251 (GENNUM CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 1, lines 13-18 * * page 2, lines 9-20 * * page 6, lines 13-30 * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 19; figures 4,6 * |