EP1139239 - Scheme for multimedia data retrieval using event names and time or location information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/40] | Scheme for multimedia data retrieval using event names and time or location information | ||
[2004/02] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanai, Tatsunori, Intellectual Prop. Div. Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Maeda, Seiji, Intellectual Prop. Div. Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yao, Hiroshi, Intellectual Prop. Div. Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yano, Hirokuni, Intellectual Prop. Div. Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Marks & Clerk 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields GB-London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302833.7 | 27.03.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | JP20000091024 | 29.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000091024 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1139239 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1139239 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
G06F16/58 (EP,US);
G06F16/487 (EP,US);
G06F16/532 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/40] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schema zum Auffinden von multimedialen Daten unter Benutzung von Ereignisnamen und Zeit- oder Ortsinformationen | [2001/40] | English: | Scheme for multimedia data retrieval using event names and time or location information | [2004/02] | French: | Schéma de recouvrement d'informations multimédia en utilisant des noms d'événements et des informations de temps et de location | [2001/40] |
Former [2001/40] | Scheme for multimedia data retrieval using event names and time or location information | Examination procedure | 03.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.06.2006 | 06.06.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/08] | 05.09.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0678816 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 47 - column 4, line 26 * * column 7, lines 26-42 * * claims 46-48 *; | [A]US5870754 (DIMITROVA NEVENKA [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 26; figure 12 *; | [A]JPH08115337 | [XA] - ANONYMOUS, "Indexing and recall of capture events", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (199906), vol. 422, no. 66, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007124469 [X] 1-3,6-9,12-15,17-20 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,10,11,16 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08115337 A 19960507 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |