EP1138580 - Body structure of vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | [2008/21] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takase, Minoru Fuji Jukogyo K.K., 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Nagasawa, Isamu Fuji Jukogyo K.K., 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 03 /
Itoi, Isao Fuji Jukogyo K.K., 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302836.0 | 27.03.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | JP20000086577 | 27.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000086577 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1138580 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1138580 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1138580 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
B62D21/152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2004/37] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugrahmenstruktur | [2001/40] | English: | Body structure of vehicle | [2001/40] | French: | Structure de carrosserie de véhicule | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 18.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.05.2008 | [2009/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3881742 (FELZER BERTOLD) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 57; figure - *; | [X]US5275436 (POMERO CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1-5 * column 5, line 8 - column 7, line 28; figure - *; | [X]US5482322 (WHEATLEY DONALD G [US], et al) [X] 1,2* column 3, line 49 - line 60; figure - * |